Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rocheleau, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Roy, Jean-Yves | Bloc Québécois | Matapédia—Matane | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.