Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Finley, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Haldimand—Norfolk | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Fonseca, Peter | Liberal | Mississauga East—Cooksville | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Fortier, Mona | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, April 3, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Fragiskatos, Peter | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Freeland, Hon. Chrystia | Liberal | University—Rosedale | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.