Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rayes, Alain | Conservative | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rioux, Jean R. | Liberal | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Robillard, Yves | Liberal | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Rodriguez, Hon. Pablo | Liberal | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Romanado, Sherry | Liberal | Longueuil—Charles-LeMoyne | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.